Assembly | 12/08/2023 | tabled | ||
Assembly | 12/08/2023 | vetoed memo.88 | ||
Assembly | 11/29/2023 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/09/2023 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/09/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/09/2023 | 3RD READING CAL.1807 | ||
Senate | 06/09/2023 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5653 | ||
Senate | 05/31/2023 | REFERRED TO FINANCE | ||
Assembly | 05/31/2023 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/31/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.361 | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2023 | rules report cal.361 | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2023 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/09/2023 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 03/20/2023 | referred to governmental employees |