Assembly | 11/22/2024 | approval memo.14 | ||
Assembly | 11/22/2024 | signed chap.465 | ||
Assembly | 11/15/2024 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/07/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/07/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/07/2024 | 3RD READING CAL.397 | ||
Senate | 06/07/2024 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S3249B | ||
Senate | 05/23/2024 | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 05/13/2024 | amended on third reading 5730b | ||
Assembly | 04/12/2024 | advanced to third reading cal.407 | ||
Assembly | 04/09/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 04/03/2024 | print number 5730a | ||
Assembly | 04/03/2024 | amend (t) and recommit to governmental operations | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | referred to governmental operations |