Assembly | 09/15/2023 | signed chap.392 | ||
Assembly | 09/07/2023 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | 3RD READING CAL.703 | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6062 | ||
Senate | 05/24/2023 | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2023 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.250 | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2023 | rules report cal.250 | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2023 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 04/06/2023 | print number 5742a | ||
Assembly | 04/06/2023 | amend (t) and recommit to governmental operations | ||
Assembly | 03/23/2023 | referred to governmental operations |