Assembly | 11/17/2023 | signed chap.644 | ||
Assembly | 11/13/2023 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | 3RD READING CAL.1377 | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5605 | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | HOME RULE REQUEST | ||
Senate | 05/24/2023 | REFERRED TO FINANCE | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2023 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.251 | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2023 | rules report cal.251 | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2023 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2023 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 03/23/2023 | referred to governmental employees |