Assembly | 10/25/2023 | signed chap.559 | ||
Assembly | 10/13/2023 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 05/31/2023 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/31/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/31/2023 | 3RD READING CAL.504 | ||
Senate | 05/31/2023 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5162 | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2023 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Senate | 05/23/2023 | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY | ||
Assembly | 04/27/2023 | advanced to third reading cal.176 | ||
Assembly | 04/25/2023 | reported |