Assembly | 05/31/2023 | substituted by s6150a | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.366 | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2023 | rules report cal.366 | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2023 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2023 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 05/04/2023 | print number 5783a | ||
Assembly | 05/04/2023 | amend and recommit to local governments | ||
Assembly | 03/23/2023 | referred to local governments |