Assembly | 09/17/2024 | signed chap.316 | ||
Assembly | 09/17/2024 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 05/29/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/29/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/29/2024 | 3RD READING CAL.1350 | ||
Senate | 05/29/2024 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6226A | ||
Assembly | 05/14/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/14/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Senate | 05/14/2024 | REFERRED TO HEALTH | ||
Assembly | 05/09/2024 | advanced to third reading cal.449 | ||
Assembly | 05/07/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2023 | print number 5789a | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2023 | amend (t) and recommit to health |