Assembly | 06/03/2024 | substituted by s5850c | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | rules report cal.311 | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/21/2024 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 05/15/2024 | print number 5794c | ||
Assembly | 05/15/2024 | amend and recommit to real property taxation | ||
Assembly | 03/13/2024 | print number 5794b | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | referred to real property taxation | ||
Assembly | 05/26/2023 | print number 5794a |