Assembly | 09/15/2023 | signed chap.394 | ||
Assembly | 09/07/2023 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/09/2023 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/09/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/09/2023 | 3RD READING CAL.1809 | ||
Senate | 06/09/2023 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5814A | ||
Senate | 06/09/2023 | HOME RULE REQUEST | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | REFERRED TO RULES | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2023 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.515 | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2023 | rules report cal.515 | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/31/2023 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2023 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 03/30/2023 | print number 5799a | ||
Assembly | 03/30/2023 | amend and recommit to local governments | ||
Assembly | 03/23/2023 | referred to local governments |