Assembly | 11/22/2024 | tabled | ||
Assembly | 11/22/2024 | vetoed memo.29 | ||
Assembly | 11/18/2024 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | 3RD READING CAL.1649 | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6758A | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/22/2024 | RECOMMITTED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2024 | repassed assembly | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 03/26/2024 | amended on third reading 5815b | ||
Assembly | 03/26/2024 | vote reconsidered - restored to third reading | ||
Assembly | 03/26/2024 | recalled from senate | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS | ||
Assembly | 03/18/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | ordered to third reading cal.163 | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | DIED IN SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | REFERRED TO RULES | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.632 | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2023 | rules report cal.632 | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2023 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/09/2023 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 05/02/2023 | print number 5815a | ||
Assembly | 05/02/2023 | amend and recommit to governmental operations | ||
Assembly | 03/23/2023 | referred to governmental operations |