Assembly | 09/29/2023 | signed chap.510 | ||
Assembly | 09/19/2023 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | 3RD READING CAL.1369 | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4564B | ||
Senate | 05/31/2023 | REFERRED TO RULES | ||
Assembly | 05/31/2023 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/31/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.370 | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2023 | rules report cal.370 | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2023 | amend and recommit to rules 5897b | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2023 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2023 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2023 | print number 5897a | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2023 | amend and recommit to transportation | ||
Assembly | 03/24/2023 | referred to transportation |