Assembly | 06/06/2024 | substituted by s5779e | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | rules report cal.485 | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | print number 5898e | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | amend and recommit to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | print number 5898d | ||
Assembly | 05/21/2024 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 01/17/2024 | print number 5898c | ||
Assembly | 01/17/2024 | amend and recommit to real property taxation | ||
Assembly | 01/12/2024 | reference changed to real property taxation | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | referred to ways and means | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | DIED IN SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/10/2023 | REFERRED TO RULES | ||
Assembly | 06/10/2023 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/10/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/10/2023 | home rule request | ||
Assembly | 06/10/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.852 | ||
Assembly | 06/10/2023 | rules report cal.852 | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | reference changed to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2023 | print number 5898b | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2023 | print number 5898a | ||
Assembly | 03/24/2023 | referred to real property taxation |