Assembly | 11/22/2024 | tabled | ||
Assembly | 11/22/2024 | vetoed memo.30 | ||
Assembly | 11/18/2024 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | 3RD READING CAL.1559 | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S2003A | ||
Senate | 05/13/2024 | REFERRED TO FINANCE | ||
Assembly | 05/13/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/13/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 05/08/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.42 | ||
Assembly | 05/08/2024 | rules report cal.42 | ||
Assembly | 05/08/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/07/2024 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 03/05/2024 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 02/01/2024 | print number 5909a | ||
Assembly | 02/01/2024 | amend (t) and recommit to governmental operations | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | referred to governmental operations |