Assembly | 10/25/2023 | signed chap.564 | ||
Assembly | 10/13/2023 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/09/2023 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/09/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/09/2023 | 3RD READING CAL.1505 | ||
Senate | 06/09/2023 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5741 | ||
Senate | 06/09/2023 | HOME RULE REQUEST | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | REFERRED TO RULES | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.710 | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | rules report cal.710 | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2023 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2023 | reference changed to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 03/24/2023 | referred to local governments |