Assembly | 05/30/2024 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 04/16/2024 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 04/10/2024 | print number 5936c | ||
Assembly | 04/10/2024 | amend and recommit to governmental employees | ||
Assembly | 03/14/2024 | print number 5936b | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | referred to governmental employees | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2023 | print number 5936a |