Assembly | 06/07/2024 | substituted by s4249 | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | rules report cal.599 | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2024 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 01/16/2024 | committed to judiciary | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | ordered to third reading cal.170 | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | DIED IN SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/21/2023 | REFERRED TO RULES | ||
Assembly | 06/21/2023 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/21/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/21/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.880 | ||
Assembly | 06/21/2023 | rules report cal.880 | ||
Assembly | 03/24/2023 | referred to judiciary |