Assembly | 09/29/2023 | signed chap.511 | ||
Assembly | 09/19/2023 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 05/31/2023 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/31/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/31/2023 | 3RD READING CAL.1324 | ||
Senate | 05/31/2023 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6124 | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | REFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2023 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 04/20/2023 | advanced to third reading cal.144 | ||
Assembly | 04/18/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 03/24/2023 | referred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development |