Assembly | 11/22/2024 | signed chap.466 | ||
Assembly | 11/15/2024 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | 3RD READING CAL.1351 | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7177B | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Senate | 05/23/2024 | REFERRED TO HEALTH | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.101 | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2024 | rules report cal.101 | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/21/2024 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/14/2024 | print number 5984b | ||
Assembly | 05/14/2024 | amend (t) and recommit to health | ||
Assembly | 04/01/2024 | print number 5984a | ||
Assembly | 04/01/2024 | amend and recommit to health |