Assembly | 10/25/2023 | signed chap.567 | ||
Assembly | 10/13/2023 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 05/31/2023 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/31/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/31/2023 | 3RD READING CAL.849 | ||
Senate | 05/31/2023 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S3449 | ||
Assembly | 04/26/2023 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 04/26/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Senate | 04/26/2023 | REFERRED TO HEALTH | ||
Assembly | 04/20/2023 | advanced to third reading cal.145 | ||
Assembly | 04/18/2023 | reported |