Assembly | 12/22/2023 | tabled | ||
Assembly | 12/22/2023 | vetoed memo.126 | ||
Assembly | 12/12/2023 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/09/2023 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/09/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/09/2023 | 3RD READING CAL.1366 | ||
Senate | 06/09/2023 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S3146A | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | REFERRED TO RULES | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2023 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.636 | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2023 | rules report cal.636 | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2023 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2023 | print number 6021a | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2023 | amend and recommit to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2023 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 03/30/2023 | referred to health |