Assembly | 07/19/2023 | signed chap.193 | ||
Assembly | 07/13/2023 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/09/2023 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/09/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/09/2023 | 3RD READING CAL.1332 | ||
Senate | 06/09/2023 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6886A | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2023 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.458 | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2023 | rules report cal.458 | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2023 | reported | ||
Senate | 06/01/2023 | REFERRED TO HEALTH | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2023 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/19/2023 | reference changed to higher education | ||
Assembly | 05/18/2023 | print number 6030c | ||
Assembly | 05/18/2023 | amend (t) and recommit to health | ||
Assembly | 05/12/2023 | print number 6030b | ||
Assembly | 05/12/2023 | amend and recommit to health | ||
Assembly | 05/05/2023 | print number 6030a |