Assembly | 11/22/2024 | tabled | ||
Assembly | 11/22/2024 | vetoed memo.32 | ||
Assembly | 11/15/2024 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | 3RD READING CAL.1657 | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S9131 | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/14/2024 | RECOMMITTED TO HEALTH | ||
Assembly | 05/14/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/14/2024 | repassed assembly | ||
Assembly | 05/06/2024 | amended on third reading 6034b | ||
Assembly | 05/06/2024 | vote reconsidered - restored to third reading | ||
Assembly | 05/06/2024 | recalled from senate | ||
Assembly | 03/18/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 03/18/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | REFERRED TO HEALTH | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | ordered to third reading cal.172 | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | DIED IN SENATE | ||
Assembly | 04/20/2023 | advanced to third reading cal.147 | ||
Assembly | 04/18/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 04/05/2023 | print number 6034a | ||
Assembly | 04/05/2023 | amend (t) and recommit to health |