Assembly | 01/12/2024 | reference changed to transportation | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2023 | print number 6035b | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2023 | amend (t) and recommit to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2023 | reference changed to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 06/02/2023 | print number 6035a | ||
Assembly | 06/02/2023 | amend (t) and recommit to transportation | ||
Assembly | 03/31/2023 | referred to transportation |