Assembly | 09/15/2023 | signed chap.396 | ||
Assembly | 09/07/2023 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | 3RD READING CAL.1589 | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7107 | ||
Senate | 05/17/2023 | REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS | ||
Assembly | 05/17/2023 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/17/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 05/17/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.167 | ||
Assembly | 05/17/2023 | rules report cal.167 | ||
Assembly | 05/17/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2023 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 04/11/2023 | print number 6085a | ||
Assembly | 04/11/2023 | amend and recommit to economic development | ||
Assembly | 04/03/2023 | referred to economic development |