Assembly | 09/15/2023 | signed chap.398 | ||
Assembly | 09/07/2023 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | 3RD READING CAL.1107 | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5886 | ||
Senate | 04/26/2023 | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT | ||
Assembly | 04/26/2023 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 04/26/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 04/20/2023 | advanced to third reading cal.149 | ||
Assembly | 04/18/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 04/03/2023 | referred to local governments |