Assembly | 09/15/2023 | signed chap.399 | ||
Assembly | 09/07/2023 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/09/2023 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/09/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/09/2023 | 3RD READING CAL.769 | ||
Senate | 06/09/2023 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5962 | ||
Senate | 04/26/2023 | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS | ||
Assembly | 04/26/2023 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 04/26/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 04/20/2023 | advanced to third reading cal.150 | ||
Assembly | 04/17/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 04/03/2023 | referred to governmental operations |