Assembly | 09/22/2023 | signed chap.485 | ||
Assembly | 09/19/2023 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | 3RD READING CAL.1530 | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6640B | ||
Senate | 05/31/2023 | REFERRED TO FINANCE | ||
Assembly | 05/31/2023 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/31/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.375 | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2023 | rules report cal.375 | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2023 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/18/2023 | print number 6113b | ||
Assembly | 05/18/2023 | amend and recommit to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2023 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 05/10/2023 | print number 6113a | ||
Assembly | 05/10/2023 | amend and recommit to real property taxation | ||
Assembly | 04/03/2023 | referred to real property taxation |