Assembly | 10/13/2023 | signed chap.523 | ||
Assembly | 10/13/2023 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | 3RD READING CAL.1688 | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6443 | ||
Senate | 05/08/2023 | REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS | ||
Assembly | 05/08/2023 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/08/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 04/27/2023 | advanced to third reading cal.181 | ||
Assembly | 04/25/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 04/03/2023 | referred to economic development |