Assembly | 05/16/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Senate | 05/16/2024 | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS | ||
Assembly | 05/15/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.50 | ||
Assembly | 05/15/2024 | rules report cal.50 | ||
Assembly | 05/15/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/13/2024 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/07/2024 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 05/02/2024 | print number 6136b | ||
Assembly | 05/02/2024 | amend and recommit to corporations, authorities and commissions | ||
Assembly | 04/04/2024 | print number 6136a | ||
Assembly | 04/04/2024 | amend (t) and recommit to corporations, authorities and commissions |