Assembly | 10/25/2023 | signed chap.568 | ||
Assembly | 10/13/2023 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 05/31/2023 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/31/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/31/2023 | 3RD READING CAL.1184 | ||
Senate | 05/31/2023 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S3612 | ||
Assembly | 05/31/2023 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/31/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Senate | 05/31/2023 | REFERRED TO INSURANCE | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.377 | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2023 | rules report cal.377 | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2023 | reported referred to rules |