LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
New York NY
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
A06168
Action History
NY
New York Assembly Bill A06168
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
New York 2023-2024 Regular Session
New York Assembly Bill A06168
Action History
Assembly
01/23/2024
substituted by s5992a
Assembly
01/18/2024
advanced to third reading cal.229
Assembly
01/17/2024
reported
Assembly
01/03/2024
referred to health
Assembly
05/18/2023
print number 6168a
Assembly
05/18/2023
amend (t) and recommit to health