Assembly | 12/22/2023 | approval memo.68 | ||
Assembly | 12/22/2023 | signed chap.744 | ||
Assembly | 12/12/2023 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | 3RD READING CAL.1330 | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6815 | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | REFERRED TO RULES | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2023 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.590 | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2023 | rules report cal.590 | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2023 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/31/2023 | reference changed to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 05/19/2023 | print number 6180a | ||
Assembly | 05/19/2023 | amend and recommit to health | ||
Assembly | 04/03/2023 | referred to health |