Assembly | 08/23/2023 | signed chap.290 | ||
Assembly | 08/11/2023 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | 3RD READING CAL.937 | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6190A | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | HOME RULE REQUEST | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | REFERRED TO RULES | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2023 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.638 | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2023 | rules report cal.638 | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2023 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2023 | print number 6202a | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2023 | amend and recommit to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 04/03/2023 | referred to ways and means |