Assembly | 06/05/2024 | substituted by s7555a | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2024 | rules report cal.441 | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/21/2024 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 05/15/2024 | print number 6203b | ||
Assembly | 05/15/2024 | amend and recommit to real property taxation | ||
Assembly | 01/17/2024 | reference changed to real property taxation | ||
Assembly | 01/16/2024 | committed to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | ordered to third reading cal.175 | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | DIED IN SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/09/2023 | REFERRED TO RULES | ||
Assembly | 06/09/2023 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/09/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.768 | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | rules report cal.768 | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2023 | reference changed to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2023 | print number 6203a | ||
Assembly | 04/03/2023 | referred to real property taxation |