Assembly | 06/20/2023 | substituted by s2980c | ||
Assembly | 06/20/2023 | rules report cal.864 | ||
Assembly | 06/20/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/31/2023 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2023 | reported referred to codes | ||
Assembly | 05/19/2023 | print number 6216b | ||
Assembly | 05/19/2023 | amend (t) and recommit to housing | ||
Assembly | 04/14/2023 | print number 6216a | ||
Assembly | 04/03/2023 | referred to housing |