Assembly | 06/03/2024 | substituted by s6584c | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | rules report cal.312 | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/21/2024 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 05/15/2024 | print number 6219b | ||
Assembly | 05/15/2024 | amend and recommit to governmental operations | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | referred to governmental operations | ||
Assembly | 11/27/2023 | print number 6219a |