Assembly | 01/03/2024 | referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 10/13/2023 | print number 6221b | ||
Assembly | 10/13/2023 | amend and recommit to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2023 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 05/12/2023 | print number 6221a | ||
Assembly | 05/12/2023 | amend and recommit to health | ||
Assembly | 04/03/2023 | referred to health |