Assembly | 11/22/2024 | tabled | ||
Assembly | 11/22/2024 | vetoed memo.34 | ||
Assembly | 11/15/2024 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | 3RD READING CAL.1469 | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S1694B | ||
Senate | 05/28/2024 | REFERRED TO FINANCE | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2024 | amended on third reading (t) 6253a | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | ordered to third reading cal.177 | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.640 | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2023 | rules report cal.640 | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2023 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2023 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 04/03/2023 | referred to energy |