LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
New York NY
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
A06276
Action History
NY
New York Assembly Bill A06276
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
New York 2023-2024 Regular Session
New York Assembly Bill A06276
Action History
Assembly
01/03/2024
ordered to third reading cal.178
Assembly
05/15/2023
amended on third reading 6276a
Assembly
04/27/2023
advanced to third reading cal.182
Assembly
04/25/2023
reported
Assembly
04/03/2023
referred to housing