Assembly | 01/16/2024 | committed to transportation | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | ordered to third reading cal.179 | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | DIED IN SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/09/2023 | REFERRED TO RULES | ||
Assembly | 06/09/2023 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/09/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/09/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.790 | ||
Assembly | 06/09/2023 | rules report cal.790 | ||
Assembly | 06/09/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 06/09/2023 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2023 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 05/15/2023 | print number 6284a | ||
Assembly | 05/15/2023 | amend and recommit to transportation | ||
Assembly | 04/03/2023 | referred to transportation |