Assembly | 01/03/2024 | ordered to third reading cal.180 | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.717 | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | rules report cal.717 | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2023 | reported referred to codes | ||
Assembly | 05/18/2023 | print number 6289b | ||
Assembly | 05/18/2023 | amend and recommit to children and families | ||
Assembly | 05/17/2023 | print number 6289a | ||
Assembly | 04/03/2023 | referred to children and families |