Assembly | 12/22/2023 | approval memo.69 | ||
Assembly | 12/22/2023 | signed chap.745 | ||
Assembly | 12/12/2023 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | 3RD READING CAL.197 | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S264A | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2023 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.263 | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2023 | rules report cal.263 | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2023 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/17/2023 | reported referred to codes | ||
Assembly | 05/12/2023 | print number 6291a | ||
Assembly | 05/12/2023 | amend (t) and recommit to people with disabilities | ||
Assembly | 04/03/2023 | referred to people with disabilities |