Senate | 06/07/2024 | REFERRED TO RULES | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | ordered to third reading cal.182 | ||
Assembly | 04/27/2023 | advanced to third reading cal.183 | ||
Assembly | 04/25/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 04/03/2023 | referred to housing |