Assembly | 07/28/2023 | signed chap.226 | ||
Assembly | 07/21/2023 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 05/24/2023 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/24/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/24/2023 | 3RD READING CAL.940 | ||
Senate | 05/24/2023 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6228 | ||
Senate | 05/24/2023 | HOME RULE REQUEST | ||
Senate | 05/16/2023 | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2023 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 05/11/2023 | advanced to third reading cal.213 | ||
Assembly | 05/09/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 04/04/2023 | referred to ways and means |