Senate | 06/03/2024 | REFERRED TO RULES | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.315 | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | rules report cal.315 | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 03/26/2024 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 01/26/2024 | print number 6342a | ||
Assembly | 01/26/2024 | amend and recommit to governmental employees | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | referred to governmental employees |