Senate | 05/22/2024 | REFERRED TO DISABILITIES | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 05/20/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.71 | ||
Assembly | 05/20/2024 | rules report cal.71 | ||
Assembly | 05/20/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/20/2024 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2024 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 05/10/2024 | print number 6397a | ||
Assembly | 05/10/2024 | amend (t) and recommit to people with disabilities | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | referred to people with disabilities |