Assembly | 06/07/2024 | substituted by s6110c | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | rules report cal.602 | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/21/2024 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 05/08/2024 | print number 6404c | ||
Assembly | 05/08/2024 | amend (t) and recommit to local governments | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | referred to local governments | ||
Assembly | 07/19/2023 | print number 6404b | ||
Assembly | 05/10/2023 | print number 6404a |