Assembly | 12/08/2023 | approval memo.40 | ||
Assembly | 12/08/2023 | signed chap.690 | ||
Assembly | 11/29/2023 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | 3RD READING CAL.1648 | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6249 | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | HOME RULE REQUEST | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | REFERRED TO RULES | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2023 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.521 | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2023 | rules report cal.521 | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2023 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2023 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 04/06/2023 | referred to transportation |