Assembly | 06/07/2024 | substituted by s6141b | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | rules report cal.564 | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | reference changed to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 03/12/2024 | print number 6508b | ||
Assembly | 03/12/2024 | amend (t) and recommit to governmental employees | ||
Assembly | 01/18/2024 | print number 6508a | ||
Assembly | 01/18/2024 | amend and recommit to governmental employees | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | referred to governmental employees |