Senate | 03/21/2024 | REFERRED TO FINANCE | ||
Assembly | 03/21/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 03/21/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 01/08/2024 | amended on third reading 6517a | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | ordered to third reading cal.187 | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | DIED IN SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | REFERRED TO RULES | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.525 | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2023 | rules report cal.525 | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2023 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2023 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 04/12/2023 | referred to governmental operations |